> Choose a number over 100 (START WITH SMALLER NUMBER).

> The last two places will be the square of

the last two digits (keep if any carry) _ _ _ X X.

> The first three places will be the number plus

the last two digits plus any carry: X X X _ _.

here is an Example:

> let the number be 108:

2. Square the last two digits (no carry): 8 × 8 = 64: _ _ _ 64

3. Add the last two digits to the number: 108 + 08= 116:

so 1 1 6 _ _

4. So 108 × 108 = 11664.

### square of numbers in 100's

Posted by
SHRENIK
on Wednesday, September 16, 2009

Labels:
SQUARE OF A NUMBER
/
Comments: (6)

### FIND SQUARE OF NUMBERS IN 200 TO 299

Posted by
SHRENIK

Labels:
FUN WITH NUMBERS,
SQUARE OF A NUMBER
/
Comments: (2)

steps to find square of numbers in 200's

> Choose a number in the 200s (start with numbers under 210, then try for larger ones).

>The first digit of the square is 4: 4 _ _ _ _

> The next two digits will be 4 times the last 2 digits: _ X X _ _

> The last two places will be the square of the last digit: _ _ _ X X

here we take an Example:

> let the number be 207:

> The first digit is 4

so 4 _ _ _ _

> The next two digits are 4 times the last digit:

4 × 7 = 28

so _ 2 8 _ _

Square the last digit: 7× 7 = 49

so _ _ _ 49

So finally we get 206 × 206 = 42849.

and For larger numbers work right to left:

> Square the last two digits (keep the carry): _ _ _ X X

> 4 times the last two digits + carry: _ X X _ _

> Square the first digit + carry: X _ _ _ _

example

>If the number to be squared is 225:

> Square last two digits (keep carry):

25x25 = 625 (keep 6): _ _ _ 2 5

> 4 times the last two digits + carry:

4x25 = 100; 100+6 = 106 (keep 1): _ 0 6 _ _

> Square the first digit + carry:

2x2 = 4; 4+1 = 5: 5 _ _ _ _

> So 225 × 225 = 50625.

> Choose a number in the 200s (start with numbers under 210, then try for larger ones).

>The first digit of the square is 4: 4 _ _ _ _

> The next two digits will be 4 times the last 2 digits: _ X X _ _

> The last two places will be the square of the last digit: _ _ _ X X

here we take an Example:

> let the number be 207:

> The first digit is 4

so 4 _ _ _ _

> The next two digits are 4 times the last digit:

4 × 7 = 28

so _ 2 8 _ _

Square the last digit: 7× 7 = 49

so _ _ _ 49

So finally we get 206 × 206 = 42849.

and For larger numbers work right to left:

> Square the last two digits (keep the carry): _ _ _ X X

> 4 times the last two digits + carry: _ X X _ _

> Square the first digit + carry: X _ _ _ _

example

>If the number to be squared is 225:

> Square last two digits (keep carry):

25x25 = 625 (keep 6): _ _ _ 2 5

> 4 times the last two digits + carry:

4x25 = 100; 100+6 = 106 (keep 1): _ 0 6 _ _

> Square the first digit + carry:

2x2 = 4; 4+1 = 5: 5 _ _ _ _

> So 225 × 225 = 50625.

### QUIZ

Posted by
SHRENIK
on Friday, July 24, 2009

Labels:
FUN,
FUN WITH NUMBERS
/
Comments: (10)

can anyone make 3 using two 2's???

ONE ANSWER IS

2^0 + 2=3

IF YOU HAVE ANY ANSWER POST IT AS COMMENT........

ONE ANSWER IS

2^0 + 2=3

IF YOU HAVE ANY ANSWER POST IT AS COMMENT........

### EASY MULTIPLICATION TRICK

Posted by
SHRENIK

Labels:
FUN WITH NUMBERS,
multiply
/
Comments: (1)

Method for multiplying numbers where the first figures are the same and the last figures add up to 10

FOR EG:

32 x 38 = 1216

Both numbers here start with 3 THEY ARE SAME and the last

figures (2 and 8) add up to 10

So we just multiply 3 by 4 (the next number up)

to get 12 for the first part of the answer.

And we multiply the last figures: 2 x 8 = 16 to

get the last part of the answer.

· And 81 x 89 = 7209

We put 09 since we need two figures as in all the other examples

FOR EG:

32 x 38 = 1216

Both numbers here start with 3 THEY ARE SAME and the last

figures (2 and 8) add up to 10

So we just multiply 3 by 4 (the next number up)

to get 12 for the first part of the answer.

And we multiply the last figures: 2 x 8 = 16 to

get the last part of the answer.

· And 81 x 89 = 7209

We put 09 since we need two figures as in all the other examples

### MATHS PUZZLE

Posted by
SHRENIK

Labels:
FUN,
FUN WITH NUMBERS,
MATHS,
PUZZLE
/
Comments: (7)

solve this

Village A has a population of 70,000, which is decreasing at the rate of 1000 per year.

Village B has a population of 52000, which is increasing at the rate of 400 half yearly

.How many years will they take to reach same population

try its easy .............

leave your answer as a comment......

ANSWER

let,after x yrs their will b same...

after x yrs in A population decreases 1000x & in B population increases (2*400*x)=800x .

So,

70000-1000x = 52000 + 800x

x= 10

Village A has a population of 70,000, which is decreasing at the rate of 1000 per year.

Village B has a population of 52000, which is increasing at the rate of 400 half yearly

.How many years will they take to reach same population

try its easy .............

leave your answer as a comment......

ANSWER

let,after x yrs their will b same...

after x yrs in A population decreases 1000x & in B population increases (2*400*x)=800x .

So,

70000-1000x = 52000 + 800x

x= 10

### SIMPLE TRICKS TO MULTIPLY

Posted by
SHRENIK
on Wednesday, July 15, 2009

Labels:
FUN,
FUN WITH NUMBERS,
MAGIC,
multiply
/
Comments: (1)

Multiply by 5: Multiply by 10 and divide by 2.

Multiply by 6: Sometimes multiplying by 3 and then 2 is easy.

Multiply by 9: Multiply by 10 and subtract the original number.

Multiply by 12: Multiply by 10 and add twice the original number.

Multiply by 13: Multiply by 3 and add 10 times original number.

Multiply by 14: Multiply by 7 and then multiply by 2

Multiply by 15: Multiply by 10 and add 5 times the original number, as above.

Multiply by 16: You can double four times, if you want to. Or you can multiply by 8 and then by 2.

Multiply by 17: Multiply by 7 and add 10 times original number.

Multiply by 18: Multiply by 20 and subtract twice the original number (which is obvious from the first step).

Multiply by 19: Multiply by 20 and subtract the original number.

Multiply by 24: Multiply by 8 and then multiply by 3.

Multiply by 27: Multiply by 30 and subtract 3 times the original number (which is obvious from the first step).

Multiply by 45: Multiply by 50 and subtract 5 times the original number (which is obvious from the first step).

Multiply by 90: Multiply by 9 (as above) and put a zero on the right.

Multiply by 98: Multiply by 100 and subtract twice the original number.

Multiply by 99: Multiply by 100 and subtract the original number.

Multiply by 6: Sometimes multiplying by 3 and then 2 is easy.

Multiply by 9: Multiply by 10 and subtract the original number.

Multiply by 12: Multiply by 10 and add twice the original number.

Multiply by 13: Multiply by 3 and add 10 times original number.

Multiply by 14: Multiply by 7 and then multiply by 2

Multiply by 15: Multiply by 10 and add 5 times the original number, as above.

Multiply by 16: You can double four times, if you want to. Or you can multiply by 8 and then by 2.

Multiply by 17: Multiply by 7 and add 10 times original number.

Multiply by 18: Multiply by 20 and subtract twice the original number (which is obvious from the first step).

Multiply by 19: Multiply by 20 and subtract the original number.

Multiply by 24: Multiply by 8 and then multiply by 3.

Multiply by 27: Multiply by 30 and subtract 3 times the original number (which is obvious from the first step).

Multiply by 45: Multiply by 50 and subtract 5 times the original number (which is obvious from the first step).

Multiply by 90: Multiply by 9 (as above) and put a zero on the right.

Multiply by 98: Multiply by 100 and subtract twice the original number.

Multiply by 99: Multiply by 100 and subtract the original number.

### Square 2 Digit Number:WITH UP-DOWN Method

Posted by
SHRENIK

Labels:
FUN,
FUN WITH NUMBERS,
SQUARE OF A NUMBER
/
Comments: (1)

Square a 2 Digit Number, for this example 37:

> Look for the nearest 10 boundary

> In this case up 3 from 37 to 40.

> Since you went UP 3 to 40 go DOWN 3 from 37 to 34.

> Now mentally multiply 34x40

> The way I do it is 34x10=340;

> Double it mentally to 680

> Double it again mentally to 1360

> This 1360 is the FIRST interim answer.

> 37 is "3" away from the 10 boundary 40.

> Square this "3" distance from 10 boundary.

> 3x3=9 which is the SECOND interim answer.

> Add the two interim answers to get the final answer.

> Answer: 1360 + 9 = 1369

> Look for the nearest 10 boundary

> In this case up 3 from 37 to 40.

> Since you went UP 3 to 40 go DOWN 3 from 37 to 34.

> Now mentally multiply 34x40

> The way I do it is 34x10=340;

> Double it mentally to 680

> Double it again mentally to 1360

> This 1360 is the FIRST interim answer.

> 37 is "3" away from the 10 boundary 40.

> Square this "3" distance from 10 boundary.

> 3x3=9 which is the SECOND interim answer.

> Add the two interim answers to get the final answer.

> Answer: 1360 + 9 = 1369

### TRICK TO SUBSTRACT NUMBER EASILY

Posted by
SHRENIK

Labels:
FUN,
FUN WITH NUMBERS,
SUBSTRACT
/
Comments: (1)

this is an easy trick

To subtract a large number from 1,000

subtract all but the last number from 9, then subtract the last number from 10

1000

-547

step1: subtract 5 from 9 = 4

step2: subtract 4 from 9 = 5

step3: subtract 7 from 10 = 3

answer: 453

To subtract a large number from 1,000

subtract all but the last number from 9, then subtract the last number from 10

1000

-547

step1: subtract 5 from 9 = 4

step2: subtract 4 from 9 = 5

step3: subtract 7 from 10 = 3

answer: 453

### BEAUTY OF MATHS

Posted by
SHRENIK
on Saturday, June 27, 2009

Labels:
FUN,
FUN WITH NUMBERS
/
Comments: (2)

1 x 8 + 1 = 9

12 x 8 + 2 = 98

123 x 8 + 3 = 987

1234 x 8 + 4 = 9876

12345 x 8 + 5 = 98765

123456 x 8 + 6 = 987654

1234567 x 8 + 7 = 9876543

12345678 x 8 + 8 = 98765432

123456789 x 8 + 9 = 987654321

1 x 9 + 2 = 11

12 x 9 + 3 = 111

123 x 9 + 4 = 1111

1234 x 9 + 5 = 11111

12345 x 9 + 6 = 111111

123456 x 9 + 7 = 1111111

1234567 x 9 + 8 = 11111111

12345678 x 9 + 9 = 111111111

123456789 x 9 + 10 = 1111111111

9 x 9 + 7 = 88

98 x 9 + 6 = 888

987 x 9 + 5 = 8888

9876 x 9 + 4 = 88888

98765 x 9 + 3 = 888888

987654 x 9 + 2 = 8888888

9876543 x 9 + 1 = 88888888

98765432 x 9 + 0 = 888888888

1 x 1 = 1

11 x 11 = 121

111 x 111 = 12321

1111 x 1111 = 1234321

11111 x 11111 = 123454321

111111 x 111111 = 12345654321

1111111 x 1111111 = 1234567654321

11111111 x 11111111 = 123456787654321

111111111 x 111111111 = 12345678987654321

12345679 x 9 = 111111111

12345679 x 18 = 222222222

12345679 x 27 = 333333333

12345679 x 36 = 444444444

12345679 x 45 = 555555555

12345679 x 54 = 666666666

12345679 x 63 = 777777777

12345679 x 72 = 888888888

12345679 x 81 = 999999999

9 x 9 = 81

99 x 99 = 9801

999 x 999 = 998001

9999 x 9999 = 99980001

99999 x 99999 = 9999800001

999999 x 999999 = 999998000001

9999999 x 9999999 = 99999980000001

99999999 x 99999999 = 9999999800000001

999999999 x 999999999 = 999999998000000001

6 x 7 = 42

66 x 67 = 4422

666 x 667 = 444222

6666 x 6667 = 44442222

66666 x 66667 = 4444422222

666666 x 666667 = 444444222222

6666666 x 6666667 = 44444442222222

66666666 x 66666667 = 4444444422222222

666666666 x 666666667 = 444444444222222222

12 x 8 + 2 = 98

123 x 8 + 3 = 987

1234 x 8 + 4 = 9876

12345 x 8 + 5 = 98765

123456 x 8 + 6 = 987654

1234567 x 8 + 7 = 9876543

12345678 x 8 + 8 = 98765432

123456789 x 8 + 9 = 987654321

1 x 9 + 2 = 11

12 x 9 + 3 = 111

123 x 9 + 4 = 1111

1234 x 9 + 5 = 11111

12345 x 9 + 6 = 111111

123456 x 9 + 7 = 1111111

1234567 x 9 + 8 = 11111111

12345678 x 9 + 9 = 111111111

123456789 x 9 + 10 = 1111111111

9 x 9 + 7 = 88

98 x 9 + 6 = 888

987 x 9 + 5 = 8888

9876 x 9 + 4 = 88888

98765 x 9 + 3 = 888888

987654 x 9 + 2 = 8888888

9876543 x 9 + 1 = 88888888

98765432 x 9 + 0 = 888888888

1 x 1 = 1

11 x 11 = 121

111 x 111 = 12321

1111 x 1111 = 1234321

11111 x 11111 = 123454321

111111 x 111111 = 12345654321

1111111 x 1111111 = 1234567654321

11111111 x 11111111 = 123456787654321

111111111 x 111111111 = 12345678987654321

12345679 x 9 = 111111111

12345679 x 18 = 222222222

12345679 x 27 = 333333333

12345679 x 36 = 444444444

12345679 x 45 = 555555555

12345679 x 54 = 666666666

12345679 x 63 = 777777777

12345679 x 72 = 888888888

12345679 x 81 = 999999999

9 x 9 = 81

99 x 99 = 9801

999 x 999 = 998001

9999 x 9999 = 99980001

99999 x 99999 = 9999800001

999999 x 999999 = 999998000001

9999999 x 9999999 = 99999980000001

99999999 x 99999999 = 9999999800000001

999999999 x 999999999 = 999999998000000001

6 x 7 = 42

66 x 67 = 4422

666 x 667 = 444222

6666 x 6667 = 44442222

66666 x 66667 = 4444422222

666666 x 666667 = 444444222222

6666666 x 6666667 = 44444442222222

66666666 x 66666667 = 4444444422222222

666666666 x 666666667 = 444444444222222222

### Temperature Conversion

Posted by
SHRENIK

Labels:
FUN,
FUN WITH NUMBERS,
MATHS,
TEMPERATURE CONVERSION
/
Comments: (2)

Temperature Conversion

This is a easy trick to convert Fahrenheit to Celsius & vice versa.

The answer you will get will not be an exact one, but it will give you an idea of the temperature you are looking at.

Fahrenheit to Celsius:

Take 30 away from the Fahrenheit, then divide the answer by 2. This is your answer in Celsius.

Example:

94 Fahrenheit - 30 = 64. Then divide by two, 32 Celsius.

so 94 Fahrenheit = 32 Celsius.

Celsius to Fahrenheit just do the reverse:

Double it, then add 30.

40 Celsius double it, is 80, then add 30 is 110

40 Celsius = 110 Fahrenheit

This is a easy trick to convert Fahrenheit to Celsius & vice versa.

The answer you will get will not be an exact one, but it will give you an idea of the temperature you are looking at.

Fahrenheit to Celsius:

Take 30 away from the Fahrenheit, then divide the answer by 2. This is your answer in Celsius.

Example:

94 Fahrenheit - 30 = 64. Then divide by two, 32 Celsius.

so 94 Fahrenheit = 32 Celsius.

Celsius to Fahrenheit just do the reverse:

Double it, then add 30.

40 Celsius double it, is 80, then add 30 is 110

40 Celsius = 110 Fahrenheit

### TRICK TO GET UR TELEPHONE NUMBER

Posted by
SHRENIK
on Wednesday, March 25, 2009

Labels:
CALCULATOR TRICK,
FUN,
FUN WITH NUMBERS,
MAGIC
/
Comments: (3)

1. take a calculator

2. Key in the first 4 digits of your phone number (eg if ur landline is 2888xxxx TAKE 2888)

3. Multiply by 80

4. Add 1

5. Multiply by 250

6. Add the last 4 digits of your phone number

7. Add the last 4 digits of your phone number again

8. Subtract 250

9. Divide number by 2

Do you recognize the answer

yes its ur landline number................

2. Key in the first 4 digits of your phone number (eg if ur landline is 2888xxxx TAKE 2888)

3. Multiply by 80

4. Add 1

5. Multiply by 250

6. Add the last 4 digits of your phone number

7. Add the last 4 digits of your phone number again

8. Subtract 250

9. Divide number by 2

Do you recognize the answer

yes its ur landline number................

### FUNNY CALCULATOR TRICK

Posted by
SHRENIK

Labels:
CALCULATOR TRICK,
FUN,
FUN WITH NUMBERS,
MATHS
/
Comments: (1)

1. take a calculator

2. type in "12345679" (remember not 8)

3. times it by any number multiplied by 9,

lets say if u you want 5as answer , 5*9=45, so 12345679*45=?

try multiplying by: 9,18,27,36 and so on...

& see the magic of maths

2. type in "12345679" (remember not 8)

3. times it by any number multiplied by 9,

lets say if u you want 5as answer , 5*9=45, so 12345679*45=?

try multiplying by: 9,18,27,36 and so on...

& see the magic of maths

### TO FIND SQUARE OF 3-DIGIT NUMBER

Posted by
SHRENIK
on Sunday, March 8, 2009

Labels:
MATHS,
SQUARE OF A NUMBER
/
Comments: (6)

LET THE NUMBER BE ABC

SQ (ABC) is calculated like this

STEP 1. Last digit = last digit of SQ(C)

STEP 2. Second Last Digit = 2*B*C + any carryover from STEP 1.

STEP 3. Third Last Digit 2*A*C+ Sq(B) + any carryover from STEP

2.

STEP 4. Fourth last digit is 2*A*B + any carryover from STEP 3.

STEP 5 . In the beginning of result will be Sq(A) + any carryover

from Step 4.

EXAMPLE :

SQ (431)

STEP 1. Last digit = last digit of SQ(1) =1

STEP 2. Second Last Digit = 2*3*1 + any carryover from STEP

1.= 6

STEP 3. Third Last Digit 2*4*1+ Sq(3) + any carryover from STEP

2.= 2*4*1 +9= 17. so 7 and 1 carryover

STEP 4. Fourth last digit is 2*4*3 + any carryover (which is 1) . =

24+1=25. So 5 and carry over 2.

STEP 5 . In the beginning of result will be Sq(4) + any carryover

from Step 4. So 16+2 =18.

So the result will be 185761.

SQ (ABC) is calculated like this

STEP 1. Last digit = last digit of SQ(C)

STEP 2. Second Last Digit = 2*B*C + any carryover from STEP 1.

STEP 3. Third Last Digit 2*A*C+ Sq(B) + any carryover from STEP

2.

STEP 4. Fourth last digit is 2*A*B + any carryover from STEP 3.

STEP 5 . In the beginning of result will be Sq(A) + any carryover

from Step 4.

EXAMPLE :

SQ (431)

STEP 1. Last digit = last digit of SQ(1) =1

STEP 2. Second Last Digit = 2*3*1 + any carryover from STEP

1.= 6

STEP 3. Third Last Digit 2*4*1+ Sq(3) + any carryover from STEP

2.= 2*4*1 +9= 17. so 7 and 1 carryover

STEP 4. Fourth last digit is 2*4*3 + any carryover (which is 1) . =

24+1=25. So 5 and carry over 2.

STEP 5 . In the beginning of result will be Sq(4) + any carryover

from Step 4. So 16+2 =18.

So the result will be 185761.

### SHORT CUT TO MULTIPLY ANY NO BY 12

EG: IF WE WANT TO PERFORM

12 X 6

The first thing is to always multiply the 1 of the twelve by the

number we are multiplying by, in this case 6. So 1 X 6 = 6.

Multiply this 6 by 10 giving 60.

Now multiply the 6 by the 2 of twelve giving 12. Add this to 60 giving 72.

Therefore 6 X 12 = 72

12 X 6

The first thing is to always multiply the 1 of the twelve by the

number we are multiplying by, in this case 6. So 1 X 6 = 6.

Multiply this 6 by 10 giving 60.

Now multiply the 6 by the 2 of twelve giving 12. Add this to 60 giving 72.

Therefore 6 X 12 = 72

### METHOD OF MULTIPLICATION

Posted by
SHRENIK
on Wednesday, February 25, 2009

i will show u one more method of multiplication.

IT IS VERY EASY

EG:

96*96

take hundred as the reference.then think what should be subtracted from 96 to make it hundred.

-4.

then write like this

96 96

-4 -4

add diagonally 96-4=92

multiply -4*-4=16

the product of 96*96 will be 9216

IF U LIKE THIS TRICK PLZ LEAVE UR COMMENTS

IT IS VERY EASY

EG:

96*96

take hundred as the reference.then think what should be subtracted from 96 to make it hundred.

-4.

then write like this

96 96

-4 -4

add diagonally 96-4=92

multiply -4*-4=16

the product of 96*96 will be 9216

IF U LIKE THIS TRICK PLZ LEAVE UR COMMENTS

### INCREASE UR SPEED OF MULTIPLICATION

take a number ending with 5 and then multiply it by itself

a simple method

eg:35*35

multiply the first digit ie 3 with the (digit+1)=4

3*4=12

these r the first two nos of ans

the last two nos will always be 25

so the ans is 1225

a simple method

eg:35*35

multiply the first digit ie 3 with the (digit+1)=4

3*4=12

these r the first two nos of ans

the last two nos will always be 25

so the ans is 1225

### SOLVE THIS......

solve this ...

4___4___4___4=20

rules

>USe any three symbols two solve it

>u can use Multiply*, Subtract-, Add+ or divide/.........dnt use symbols twice

one solution to this problem is

[ ( 4 / 4) + 4 ] * 4

T

if u have any other u can write in comment with ur name

4___4___4___4=20

rules

>USe any three symbols two solve it

>u can use Multiply*, Subtract-, Add+ or divide/.........dnt use symbols twice

one solution to this problem is

[ ( 4 / 4) + 4 ] * 4

T

if u have any other u can write in comment with ur name

### IPL SEASON 2 TIME TABLE

India Premiere League (IPL) season 2

$$$$$ TimeTable $$$$$

>1. Bangalore Royal Challengers Vs Kolkata Knight Riders

Date : April 18, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Bangalore

>2. Kings XI Punjab Vs Chennai Super Kings

Date : April 19, 2009

Time: 5:00 PM

Ground: Mohali

>3. Delhi Daredevils Vs Rajasthan Royals

Date : April 19, 2009

Time: 8:30 PM

Ground: Delhi

>4. Kolkata Knight Riders Vs Deccan Chargers

Date : April 20, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Kolkata

>5. Mumbai Indians Vs Bangalore Royal Challengers

Date : April 20, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mumbai

>6. Rajasthan Royals Vs Kings XI Punjab

Date : April 21, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Jaipur

>7. Deccan Chargers Vs Delhi Daredevils

Date : April 22, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Hyderabad

>8. Chennai Super Kings Vs Mumbai Indians

Date : April 23, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Chennai

>9. Deccan Chargers Vs Rajasthan Royals

Date : April 24, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Hyderabad

>10. Kings XI Punjab Vs Mumbai Indians

Date : April 25, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mohali

>11. Bangalore Royal Challengers Vs Rajasthan Royals

Date : April 26, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Bangalore

>12. Chennai Super Kings Vs Kolkata Knight Riders

Date : April 26, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Chennai

>13. Mumbai Indians Vs Deccan Chargers

Date : April 27, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mumbai

>14. Kings XI Punjab Vs Delhi Daredevils

Date : April 27, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Mohali

>15. Bangalore Royal Challengers Vs Chennai Super Kings

Date : April 28, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Bangalore

>16. Kolkata Knight Riders Vs Mumbai Indians

Date : April 29, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Kolkata

>17. Delhi Daredevils Vs Bangalore Royal Challengers .

Date : April 30, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Delhi

>18. Deccan Chargers Vs Kings XI Punjab

Date : May 1, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Hyderabad

>19. Rajasthan Royals Vs Kolkata Knight Riders

Date : May 1, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Jaipur

>20. Chennai Super Kings Vs Delhi Daredevils

Date : May 2, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Chennai

>21. Bangalore Royal Challengers Vs Deccan Chargers

Date : May 3, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Bangalore

>22. Kings XI Punjab Vs Kolkata Knight Riders

Date : May 3, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mohali

>23. Mumbai Indians Vs Delhi Daredevils

Date : May 4, 2009

Time:4:00 PM

Ground: Mumbai

>24. Rajasthan Royals Vs Chennai Super Kings

Date : May 4, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Jaipur

>25. Bangalore Royal Challengers Vs Kings XI Punjab

Date : May 5, 2009

Time:8:00 PM

Ground: Bangalore

>26. Chennai Super Kings Vs Deccan Chargers

Date : May 6, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Chennai

>27. Mumbai Indians Vs Rajasthan Royals

Date : May 7, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mumbai

>28. Delhi Daredevils Vs Chennai Super Kings

Date : May 8, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Delhi

>29. Kolkata Knight Riders Vs Bangalore Royal Challengers

Date : May 8, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Kolkata

>30. Rajasthan Royals Vs Deccan Chargers

Date : May 9, 2009

Time:8:00 PM

Ground: Jaipur

>31. Chennai Super Kings Vs Kings XI Punjab

Date : May 10, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Chennai

>32. Deccan Chargers Vs Kolkata Knight Riders

Date : May 11, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Hyderabad

>33. Rajasthan Royals vs Delhi Daredevils

Date : May 11, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Jaipur

>34. Kings XI Punjab Vs Bangalore Royal Challengers

Date : May 12, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mohali

>35. Kolkata Knight Riders Vs Delhi Daredevils

Date : May 13, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Kolkata

>36. Mumbai Indians Vs Chennai Super Kings

Date : May 14, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mumbai

>37. Delhi Daredevils Vs Deccan Chargers

Date : May 15, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Delhi

>38. Mumbai Indians Vs Kolkata Knight Riders

Date : May 16, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mumbai

>39. Delhi Daredevils Vs Kings XI Punjab

Date : May 17, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Delhi

>40. Rajasthan Royals Vs Bangalore Royal Challengers

Date : May 17, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Jaipur

>41. Deccan Chargers Vs Mumbai Indians

Date : May 18, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Hyderabad

>42. Kolkata Knight Riders Vs Chennai Super Kings

Date : May 18, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Kolkata

>43. Bangalore Royal Challengers Vs Delhi Daredevils

Date : May 19, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Bangalore

>44. Kolkata Knight Riders Vs Rajasthan Royals

Date : May 20, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Kolkata

>45. Mumbai Indians Vs Kings XI Punjab

Date : May 21, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Mumbai

>46. Chennai Super Kings Vs Bangalore Royal Challengers

Date : May 21, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Chennai

>47. Delhi Daredevils Vs Kolkata Knight Riders

Date : May 22, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Delhi

>48. Kings XI Punjab Vs Deccan Chargers

Date : May 23, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mohali

>49. Delhi Daredevils Vs Mumbai Indians

Date : May 24, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Delhi

>50. Chennai Super Kings Vs Rajasthan Royals

Date : May 24, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Chennai

>51. Deccan Chargers Vs Bangalore Royal Challengers

Date : May 25, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Hyderabad

>52. Kolkata Knight Riders Vs Kings XI Punjab

Date : May 25, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Kolkata

>53. Rajasthan Royals Vs Mumbai Indians

Date : May 26, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Jaipur

>54. Deccan Chargers Vs Chennai Super Kings

Date : May 27, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Hyderabad

>55. Bangalore Royal Challengers Vs Mumbai Indians

Date : May 28, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Bangalore

>56. Kings XI Punjab Vs Rajasthan Royals

Date : May 28, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mohali

>May 29 is the day For Rest

>1st semi-final

Date : May 30, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mumbai

>2nd semi-final

Date : May 31, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mumbai

>$$$ Final $$$

Date : June 1, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mumbai

$$$$$ TimeTable $$$$$

>1. Bangalore Royal Challengers Vs Kolkata Knight Riders

Date : April 18, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Bangalore

>2. Kings XI Punjab Vs Chennai Super Kings

Date : April 19, 2009

Time: 5:00 PM

Ground: Mohali

>3. Delhi Daredevils Vs Rajasthan Royals

Date : April 19, 2009

Time: 8:30 PM

Ground: Delhi

>4. Kolkata Knight Riders Vs Deccan Chargers

Date : April 20, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Kolkata

>5. Mumbai Indians Vs Bangalore Royal Challengers

Date : April 20, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mumbai

>6. Rajasthan Royals Vs Kings XI Punjab

Date : April 21, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Jaipur

>7. Deccan Chargers Vs Delhi Daredevils

Date : April 22, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Hyderabad

>8. Chennai Super Kings Vs Mumbai Indians

Date : April 23, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Chennai

>9. Deccan Chargers Vs Rajasthan Royals

Date : April 24, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Hyderabad

>10. Kings XI Punjab Vs Mumbai Indians

Date : April 25, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mohali

>11. Bangalore Royal Challengers Vs Rajasthan Royals

Date : April 26, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Bangalore

>12. Chennai Super Kings Vs Kolkata Knight Riders

Date : April 26, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Chennai

>13. Mumbai Indians Vs Deccan Chargers

Date : April 27, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mumbai

>14. Kings XI Punjab Vs Delhi Daredevils

Date : April 27, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Mohali

>15. Bangalore Royal Challengers Vs Chennai Super Kings

Date : April 28, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Bangalore

>16. Kolkata Knight Riders Vs Mumbai Indians

Date : April 29, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Kolkata

>17. Delhi Daredevils Vs Bangalore Royal Challengers .

Date : April 30, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Delhi

>18. Deccan Chargers Vs Kings XI Punjab

Date : May 1, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Hyderabad

>19. Rajasthan Royals Vs Kolkata Knight Riders

Date : May 1, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Jaipur

>20. Chennai Super Kings Vs Delhi Daredevils

Date : May 2, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Chennai

>21. Bangalore Royal Challengers Vs Deccan Chargers

Date : May 3, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Bangalore

>22. Kings XI Punjab Vs Kolkata Knight Riders

Date : May 3, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mohali

>23. Mumbai Indians Vs Delhi Daredevils

Date : May 4, 2009

Time:4:00 PM

Ground: Mumbai

>24. Rajasthan Royals Vs Chennai Super Kings

Date : May 4, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Jaipur

>25. Bangalore Royal Challengers Vs Kings XI Punjab

Date : May 5, 2009

Time:8:00 PM

Ground: Bangalore

>26. Chennai Super Kings Vs Deccan Chargers

Date : May 6, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Chennai

>27. Mumbai Indians Vs Rajasthan Royals

Date : May 7, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mumbai

>28. Delhi Daredevils Vs Chennai Super Kings

Date : May 8, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Delhi

>29. Kolkata Knight Riders Vs Bangalore Royal Challengers

Date : May 8, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Kolkata

>30. Rajasthan Royals Vs Deccan Chargers

Date : May 9, 2009

Time:8:00 PM

Ground: Jaipur

>31. Chennai Super Kings Vs Kings XI Punjab

Date : May 10, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Chennai

>32. Deccan Chargers Vs Kolkata Knight Riders

Date : May 11, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Hyderabad

>33. Rajasthan Royals vs Delhi Daredevils

Date : May 11, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Jaipur

>34. Kings XI Punjab Vs Bangalore Royal Challengers

Date : May 12, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mohali

>35. Kolkata Knight Riders Vs Delhi Daredevils

Date : May 13, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Kolkata

>36. Mumbai Indians Vs Chennai Super Kings

Date : May 14, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mumbai

>37. Delhi Daredevils Vs Deccan Chargers

Date : May 15, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Delhi

>38. Mumbai Indians Vs Kolkata Knight Riders

Date : May 16, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mumbai

>39. Delhi Daredevils Vs Kings XI Punjab

Date : May 17, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Delhi

>40. Rajasthan Royals Vs Bangalore Royal Challengers

Date : May 17, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Jaipur

>41. Deccan Chargers Vs Mumbai Indians

Date : May 18, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Hyderabad

>42. Kolkata Knight Riders Vs Chennai Super Kings

Date : May 18, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Kolkata

>43. Bangalore Royal Challengers Vs Delhi Daredevils

Date : May 19, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Bangalore

>44. Kolkata Knight Riders Vs Rajasthan Royals

Date : May 20, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Kolkata

>45. Mumbai Indians Vs Kings XI Punjab

Date : May 21, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Mumbai

>46. Chennai Super Kings Vs Bangalore Royal Challengers

Date : May 21, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Chennai

>47. Delhi Daredevils Vs Kolkata Knight Riders

Date : May 22, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Delhi

>48. Kings XI Punjab Vs Deccan Chargers

Date : May 23, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mohali

>49. Delhi Daredevils Vs Mumbai Indians

Date : May 24, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Delhi

>50. Chennai Super Kings Vs Rajasthan Royals

Date : May 24, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Chennai

>51. Deccan Chargers Vs Bangalore Royal Challengers

Date : May 25, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Hyderabad

>52. Kolkata Knight Riders Vs Kings XI Punjab

Date : May 25, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Kolkata

>53. Rajasthan Royals Vs Mumbai Indians

Date : May 26, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Jaipur

>54. Deccan Chargers Vs Chennai Super Kings

Date : May 27, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Hyderabad

>55. Bangalore Royal Challengers Vs Mumbai Indians

Date : May 28, 2009

Time: 4:00 PM

Ground: Bangalore

>56. Kings XI Punjab Vs Rajasthan Royals

Date : May 28, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mohali

>May 29 is the day For Rest

>1st semi-final

Date : May 30, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mumbai

>2nd semi-final

Date : May 31, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mumbai

>$$$ Final $$$

Date : June 1, 2009

Time: 8:00 PM

Ground: Mumbai

### TRICK TO WRITE TABLE OF 13 EASILY

like 13 tables s written by writing tables of 1 and 3 seperately next to each other..

1 3

2 6

3 9

4 12 = 1 is carried to 4 = becomes 5 2

5 15 = 1 carried to 5 = 6 5

similarly

6 18 = 76

7 21 = 91

8 24 = 104

9 27 = 117

10 30 = 130

similarly it can be done for any number tables.

1 3

2 6

3 9

4 12 = 1 is carried to 4 = becomes 5 2

5 15 = 1 carried to 5 = 6 5

similarly

6 18 = 76

7 21 = 91

8 24 = 104

9 27 = 117

10 30 = 130

similarly it can be done for any number tables.

### TRICK TO WRITE TABLE OF 13 EASILY

like 13 tables s written by writing tables of 1 and 3 seperately next to each other..

1 3

2 6

3 9

4 12 = 1 is carried to 4 = becomes 5 2

5 15 = 1 carried to 5 = 6 5

similarly

6 18 = 76

7 21 = 91

8 24 = 104

9 27 = 117

10 30 = 130

similarly it can be done for any number tables.

1 3

2 6

3 9

4 12 = 1 is carried to 4 = becomes 5 2

5 15 = 1 carried to 5 = 6 5

similarly

6 18 = 76

7 21 = 91

8 24 = 104

9 27 = 117

10 30 = 130

similarly it can be done for any number tables.

### Convert 1 to 9 = 100

Convert 1 to 9 = 100

Convert the numbers 1 to 9 which will results to "100", by inserting any of arithmetic operations (+ - * /) into the string of above numbers.

And one more interesting thing is by keeping the numbers in the above order i.e. 123456789..

there are many solutions to above problem. if u have any plz write in the comment ......

One is: 1+2+3-4+5+6+78+9

others are

123+45-67+8-9=100

12+3+4-56/7+89=100

1+2+3+4+5+6+7+8*9=100

-1 + (2*3*4) + (5*6)+(7*8) - 9 =100

1*2+3+45+67-8-9=100

(1+2+3+4)*5+67-(8+9)=100

if u have any plz write in the comment ....

Convert the numbers 1 to 9 which will results to "100", by inserting any of arithmetic operations (+ - * /) into the string of above numbers.

And one more interesting thing is by keeping the numbers in the above order i.e. 123456789..

there are many solutions to above problem. if u have any plz write in the comment ......

One is: 1+2+3-4+5+6+78+9

others are

123+45-67+8-9=100

12+3+4-56/7+89=100

1+2+3+4+5+6+7+8*9=100

-1 + (2*3*4) + (5*6)+(7*8) - 9 =100

1*2+3+45+67-8-9=100

(1+2+3+4)*5+67-(8+9)=100

if u have any plz write in the comment ....

### Simple trick to remember table of 19

Simple trick to remember table of 19

The first digit is increamenting by 2 and second is decrementing by 1

19 * 01 = 019

19 * 02 = 038

19 * 03 = 057

19 * 04 = 076

19 * 05 = 095

19 * 06 = 114

19 * 07 = 133

19 * 08 = 152

19 * 09 = 171

19 * 10 = 190

The first digit is increamenting by 2 and second is decrementing by 1

19 * 01 = 019

19 * 02 = 038

19 * 03 = 057

19 * 04 = 076

19 * 05 = 095

19 * 06 = 114

19 * 07 = 133

19 * 08 = 152

19 * 09 = 171

19 * 10 = 190

### trick to remember table of 29

for 29 units digit decreases by 1 and tens digit increases by 3.

29 * 1 = 029

29 * 2 = 058

29 * 3 = 087

29 * 4 = 116

29 * 5 = 145

29 * 6 = 174

29 * 7 = 203

29 * 8 = 232

29 * 9 = 261

29 *10 = 290

29 * 1 = 029

29 * 2 = 058

29 * 3 = 087

29 * 4 = 116

29 * 5 = 145

29 * 6 = 174

29 * 7 = 203

29 * 8 = 232

29 * 9 = 261

29 *10 = 290

### find square of a number between 50 and 60

Posted by
SHRENIK

Labels:
MATHS,
SQUARE ROOT,
TRICK
/
Comments: (1)

find square of a number between 50 and 60

for example......

56^2=3136

57^2=3249

58^2=3364

there is a 2 steps trick to get the ans

1) add the digit at the units place to 25 and write the sum

2) then calculate the square of units place digit and write it

eg in case of 56^2

we have 25+6=31

and square of 6 is 36

hence the result is 3136

for example......

56^2=3136

57^2=3249

58^2=3364

there is a 2 steps trick to get the ans

1) add the digit at the units place to 25 and write the sum

2) then calculate the square of units place digit and write it

eg in case of 56^2

we have 25+6=31

and square of 6 is 36

hence the result is 3136

### MAGIC OF MATHS

111/1+1+1 = 37

222/2+2+2 = 37

333/3+3+3 = 37

444/4+4+4 = 37

555/5+5+5=37

666/6+6+6=37

777/7+7+7=37

888/8+8+8=37

999/9+9+9=37

222/2+2+2 = 37

333/3+3+3 = 37

444/4+4+4 = 37

555/5+5+5=37

666/6+6+6=37

777/7+7+7=37

888/8+8+8=37

999/9+9+9=37

### multiply any no with 9,99,999,9999 & so on easily

example1 - 18 * 99

step 1- put 2 zeros after 18 (as we have to mul it by 99, and 99 has 2 digits)

it becomes 1800 now

step 2- now subtract 18 from 1800

ans is 1782

example2- 482*9999

step1- put 4 zeros after 482 (as we have to mul 482 by 9999, and 9999 has 4 digits)

it becomes 4820000

step 2- subtract 482 from 4820000

ans is 4819518

step 1- put 2 zeros after 18 (as we have to mul it by 99, and 99 has 2 digits)

it becomes 1800 now

step 2- now subtract 18 from 1800

ans is 1782

example2- 482*9999

step1- put 4 zeros after 482 (as we have to mul 482 by 9999, and 9999 has 4 digits)

it becomes 4820000

step 2- subtract 482 from 4820000

ans is 4819518